+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Economic Development Committee
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Economic Development Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Economic Development Committee
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H Economic Development Committee
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- SS S offered (Lamping)--(1711S.05F)
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Lager)--(1711S05.02S)
- SA 2 to SS S offered & defeated (Holsman)--(1711S05.04S)
- SA 3 to SS S offered (Rupp)--(1711S05.07S)
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- SA 3 to SS S adopted
- SA 4 to SS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(1711S05.03S)
- SA 5 to SS S offered & adopted (Dempsey)--(1711S05.08S)
- SS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee to Floor
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 366-Lamping, et al
+ − Amendments (6)
1711S05.02S
Defeated
1711S05.03S
Adopted
1711S05.04S
Defeated
1711S05.07S
Adopted
1711S05.08S
Adopted
1711S.05F
Adopted, as amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor