+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation Committee
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SS S offered & adopted (Engler)--(1534S.02C)
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor
- Corrected Committee Report
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor