+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On April 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Transportation & Motor Vehicle Committee - Consent
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation and Motor Vehicle Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Transportation & Motor Vehicle Committee - Consent
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation and Motor Vehicle Committee
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Transportation Committee to Floor-Consent
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee-Consent
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee-Consent
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor