+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- CCS H Third Read and Passed
- H adopts CCR
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- CCS S Third Read and Passed
- CCR S offered & adopted (Cunningham)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- H distributes CCR (0090S09.1SR)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kidd)--(0090H08.02H)
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
- H conferees appointed: Ross, Christofanelli, Kelly-141, Pierson Jr., Rowland-29
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Cunningham, Sater, Riddle, Rizzo, Sifton
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Conservation and Natural Resources
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred H Conservation and Natural Resources
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Perfected
- SS S offered & adopted (Cunningham)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 35-Cunningham
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (15)
0090S09.1SR
CCR S offered (Cunningham)
0090S09.01F
Distributed
0090H08.14H
Distributed
0090H08.13H
Distributed
0090H08.12H
Distributed
0090H08.11H
Distributed
0090H08.10H
Distributed
0090H08.07H
Distributed
0090H08.09H
Distributed
0090H08.06H
Distributed
0090H08.05H
Distributed
0090H08.04H
Distributed
0090H08.02H
Distributed
0090H08.03H
Distributed
0090S.04F
SS S offered & adopted (Cunningham)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor