+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
- Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws Committee
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 35-Wallingford
On December 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor