+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 17, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Insurance Committee
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Insurance Committee
On April 2, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Insurance Committee
On March 1, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read (w/EC)
On February 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Insurance & Housing Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Insurance & Housing Committee-Consent (1282S.05C)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Concucted S Insurance & Housing Committee-Consent
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Insurance & Housing Committee
On January 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor