+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government Committee
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee - Consent
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor