+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Inf Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS S offered (DePasco) (1223S.03C)
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Commerce & Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce & Environment Committee (1223S.02C)
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Commerce & Environment Committee
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Commerce & Environment Committee
On January 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor