+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On June 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (w/EC)
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor (w/EC)
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed (w/EC)
On May 17, 2001 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On May 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- CCR/CCS H adopted
On May 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- CCR/CCS S adopted
On May 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- CCR/CCS H offered (1037S.06S)
- CCR/CCS S offered
- Motion to adopt CCR S withdrawn
On May 10, 2001 in the House:
- H Conferees Appointed
- H Refused to recede & granted conference
On May 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Requested H recede or grant conference
- S Refused to Concur in HCS, as amended
- S Conferees Appointed
On May 9, 2001 in the House:
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Crowell)
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Walton)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Holand)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Marble)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Cunningham)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Scheve)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Campbell)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Graham)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Linton)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Cunningham)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Reid)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On April 26, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Education-Elementary & Secondary Committee
On April 19, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Education-Elementary & Secondary Committee
On April 18, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Education-Elementary & Secondary Committee
On April 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Education-Elementary & Secondary Committee
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 3, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCA 1 S adopted
On March 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Education Committee to Floor w/SCA 1 - Consent
- Voted Do Pass w/SCA 1 S Education Committee-Consent
- Committee Vote Reconsidered S Education Committee
On March 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass w/SCA 1 S Education Committee
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On January 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Carter
Type:
Primary Sponsor