+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 3, 2005 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent (w/no time limit for debate)
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent (w/no time limit for debate)
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
- Hearing Scheduled H Rules Committee--(9:30 am - HR 1)
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee - Consent
- Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee - Consent
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Referred H Financial Institutions Committee
On April 4, 2005 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 1, 2005 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent
- Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee-Consent
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor