+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed, as amended
- S concurs in HA 2
- S concurs in HA 1
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended
- HA 2 H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(1685S01.02H)
- HA 1 H offered & adopted (Johnson)--(1685S01.03H)
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13)
- Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee
- Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation Committee
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee to Floor - Consent
- Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted
- Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 318-Cunningham and Libla
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor