+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Economic Development Committee
On January 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Economic Development Committee
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Economic Development Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor