+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 18, 2001 in the House:
- S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments (HCS)
On May 3, 2001 in the House:
- HPA 1 to HCS H offered & ruled out of order(Froelker)
- HCS H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 12, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways & Means Committee - Consent
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Ways & Means Committee-Consent
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Ways & Means Committee
On April 2, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
- Referred H Ways & Means Committee
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor - Consent
On March 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee-Consent
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee-Consent
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor