+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On September 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- No motion made to override Governor's veto
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HCS#2, as amended
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur in HCS#2, as amended S withdrawn
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- HA 1 to HCS#2 offered & adopted (Diehl)--(0283L07.02L)
- HA 2 to HCS#2 offered & defeated (Conway)--(0283L07.03L)
- HCS#2, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee
- HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Bill returned to committee of origin
- Voted to return bill to committee of origin
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) Committee
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred H Elections Committee
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- SA 4 S offered & adopted (Wright-Jones)--(0283S01.01S)
- SA 1 S offered & defeated (Green)--(0283S01.01F)
- SA 2 S offered (Justus)--(0283S01.17S)
- SSA 1 for SA 2 S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(0283S01.02F)
- SA 3 S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(0283S01.03F)
- SA 7 S offered & defeated (Justus)--(0283S01.23S)
- SA 5 S offered & defeated (Justus)--(0283S01.04F)
- SA 6 S offered & adopted (Callahan)--(0283S01.05F)
- Perfected, as amended
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 3-Stouffer
On December 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor