+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 3-Rupp, with SA 1 (pending)
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 S offered (Lamping)--(0286S01.02S)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Education Committee to Floor
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 3-Rupp
On December 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0286S01.02S
Offered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor