+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 299-Munzlinger, with SCS (pending)
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken up for Perfection
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor w/ SCS
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - (0348S.02C)
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 299-Munzlinger
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor