+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 291, 184 & 294-Pearce, with SCS & SA 4 (pending)
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 4 to SCS S offered (Cunningham)--(1374S04.11S)
- SA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Cunningham)--(1374S04.09S)
- SA 2 to SCS S withdrawn
- SA 1 to SA 2 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Pearce)--(1374S04.01F)
- SA 2 to SCS S offered (Lembke)--(1374S04.02S)
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(1374S04.07S)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken up for Perfection
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 291, 184 & 294) S Education Committee - (1374S.04C)
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 291-Pearce
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor