+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- S defeated motion to override Governor's veto (Brown)
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Romine)--(0308S08.03S)
- SS for SCS S offered (Brown)--(0308S.08F)
- SA 3 to SCS S defeated
- Perfected
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 3 to SCS S offered (Justus)--(0308S02.01F)
- SA 2 to SCS S defeated
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken up for Perfection
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & defeated (Schaaf)--(0308S02.30S)
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 2 to SCS S offered (LeVota)--(0308S02.31S)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee - (0308S.02C)
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 29-Brown
On December 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (5)
0308S02.01F
Defeated
0308S02.30S
Defeated
0308S02.31S
Defeated
0308S08.03S
Adopted
0308S.08F
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor