+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS & SA 1 (pending)
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SCS S offered (Dougherty)--0230S02.01F
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee(0230S.02C)
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On January 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On January 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Dolan
Type:
Primary Sponsor