+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Downsizing State Government Committee
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government Committee
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H Downsizing State Government Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent w/SCS
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SB's 289 & 314) S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (1509S.02C) - Consent
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 289-Sifton
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor