+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Trade & Tourism Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Trade & Tourism Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Trade & Tourism Committee
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Trade & Tourism Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S General Laws and Pensions Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S General Laws and Pensions Committee - Consent
- Hearing Conducted S General Laws and Pensions Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S General Laws and Pensions Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 277-Walsh
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor