+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
- Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government Committee
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor