+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (w/EC)
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor (w/EC)
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On April 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed (w/EC)
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted - Consent
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Tax Policy Committee - Consent
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Tax Policy Committee - Consent
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Tax Policy Committee
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Tax Policy Committee
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 10, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read (w/EC)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS-Consent
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee-Consent (1050S.02C)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Economic Development, Tourism and Local Government Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On January 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor