+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 267-Schaefer, with SCS
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee to Floor w/SCS
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (0230S.03C)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 267-Schaefer
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor