+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on General Laws Committee - Consent
- Voted Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on General Laws Committee - Consent
- Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on General Laws Committee
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Referred H Special Standing Committee on General Laws Committee
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Removed S Consent Calendar
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On February 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0724S.02C)-Consent
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 265-Mayer, et al
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor