+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (w/ SCS/SBs 260 & 71) S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee (1376S.02C)
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On January 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor