+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On April 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On April 28, 2005 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent (w/no time limit for debate)
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent (w/no time limit for debate)
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee - Consent
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee - Consent
- Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee
On March 31, 2005 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government Committee
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee - Consent
On February 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor