+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Signed by House Speaker
- Delivered to Governor
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H International Trade Committee
- Voted Do Pass H International Trade Committee
- Reported Do Pass H International Trade Committee
- Referred to H Rules Committee
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H International Trade Committee
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 257-Silvey
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor