+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor