+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Referred H Elections Committee
- H Second Read
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (1242S.03C) - Consent
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 253-Justus
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor