+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- 005 S Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
On April 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor w/SCS
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass w/SCS SBs 249 & 523 S Ways & Means Committee
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor