+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- No motion made to override Governor's veto
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Laid over
- Taken up for Third Reading
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Utilities Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Utilities Committee
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Utilities Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred H Utilities Committee
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Holsman)--(1297S02.02S)
- SA 2 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Holsman)--(1297S02.03S)
- SA 3 to SCS S offered (Holsman)--(1297S02.07S)
- SSA 1 for SA 3 to SCS S offered (Lager)--(1297S02.05S)
- SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 3 to SCS S offered & defeated (Holsman)--(1297S02.08S)
- SSA 1 for SA 3 to SCS S adopted
- SA 4 to SCS S offered & defeated (Holsman)--(1297S02.04S)
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (1297S.02C)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 240-Lager
+ − Amendments (6)
1297S02.02S
Withdrawn
1297S02.03S
Withdrawn
1297S02.04S
Defeated
1297S02.05S
Offered
1297S02.07S
Offered
1297S02.08S
Defeated
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor