+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Laid over
- Taken up
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Workforce Development
- Voted Do Pass H Workforce Development
- Hearing Conducted H Workforce Development
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred H Workforce Development
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)
- SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Brown)
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (1045S.03C)
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 240-Schatz
On December 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (4)
1045S03.04H
Distributed
1045S03.03H
Distributed
1045S03.01S
SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schatz)
1045S03.02S
SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Brown)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor