+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) Committee
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12)
- Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Perfected
- SS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Sifton)--(1309S06.05S)
- SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(1309S06.02S)
- SS S offered (Brown)--(1309S.06F)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 239-Brown
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor