+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Litigation Reform
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Litigation Reform
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Litigation Reform
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred H Special Committee on Litigation Reform
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- SA 2 to SCS S offered (Schaaf)
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & defeated (Rizzo)
- Perfected
- SA 1 to SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Rowden)
- SA 2 to SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Government Reform Committee, with SCS
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (1000S.02C)
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 237-Rowden
On December 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (36)
1000H04.43H
Distributed
1000H04.03H
Distributed
1000H04.42H
Distributed
1000H04.40H
Distributed
1000H04.38H
Distributed
1000H04.24H
Distributed
1000H04.36H
Distributed
1000H04.35H
Distributed
1000H04.33H
Distributed
1000H04.32H
Distributed
1000H04.31H
Distributed
1000H04.29H
Distributed
1000H04.28H
Distributed
1000H04.27H
Distributed
1000H04.26H
Distributed
1000H04.21H
Distributed
1000H04.22H
Distributed
1000H04.19H
Distributed
1000H04.20H
Distributed
1000H04.18H
Distributed
1000H04.07H
Distributed
1000H04.15H
Distributed
1000H04.13H
Distributed
1000H04.11H
Distributed
1000H04.10H
Distributed
1000H04.09H
Distributed
1000H04.08H
Distributed
1000H04.02H
Distributed
1000H04.06H
Distributed
1000H04.05H
Distributed
1000H04.01H
Distributed
1000S02.01F
SA 2 to SCS S offered (Schaaf)
1000S02.05S
SA 1 to SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Rowden)
1000S02.03S
SA 2 to SCS S offered (Sifton)
1000S02.04S
SSA 1 for SA 2 to SCS S offered (Sifton)
1000S02.02S
SA 1 to SCS S offered (Rizzo)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor