+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 234-Libla, with SCS
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee w/SCS
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee (0901S.03C)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 234-Libla
On December 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor