+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Delivered to Governor
On May 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Signed by Senate President
On April 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
On April 26, 2001 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Ways & Means Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Ways & Means Committee - Consent
On April 3, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Ways & Means Committee
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Ways & Means Committee
On March 12, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 8, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS S adopted
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee Vote Reconsidered S Ways & Means Committee
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee-Consent
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee-Consent
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor