+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 334 & 228 S Ways & Means Committee
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On January 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor