+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Removed from S Consent Calendar
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS-Consent
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee-Consent (0878S.03C)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On January 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor