+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor (w/EC)
On May 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor (w/EC)
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On April 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed (w/EC)
On April 30, 2001 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent (EC adopted)
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Public Safety, Law Enforcement & Veterans Affairs Committee - Consent
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Public Safety, Law Enforcement & Veterans Affairs Committee - Consent
- Committee Vote Reconsidered
On April 3, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Public Saftey, Law Enforcement & Veterans Affairs Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Public Safety, Law Enforcement & Veterans Affairs Committee
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Public Safety, Law Enforcement & Veteran Affairs Committee
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read (w/EC)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted - Consent
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee-Consent
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee-Consent
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On January 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor