+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 24, 2001 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Banks & Financial Instiutions Com.
- Hearing Conducted H Banks & Financial Institutions Committee
On April 17, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Banks & Financial Institutions Committee
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 3, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Budget Control Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Budget Control Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Budget Control Committee
On March 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred S Budget Control Committee
On March 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SS S adopted
On March 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SS S offered (Kinder) (0844S.02F)
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Commerce & Environment Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Commerce & Environment Committee
On February 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Commerce & Environment Committee
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Commerce & Environment Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor