+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- In Conference
- H distributes CCS
- H distributes CCR
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- HA 1 H offered & adopted (Grier)--(0787S05.13H)
- HA 2 H offered & adopted (Hill)--(0787S05.18H)
- HA 3 H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(0787S05.22H)
- HA 4 H offered & Ruled out of order (Taylor-139)--(0787S05.31H)
- HA 5 H offered & adopted (Griffith)--(0787S05.01H)
- HA 6 H offered & adopted (Collins)--(0787S05.15H)
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended
- S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 5 & HA 6 and requests H recede or grant conference
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
- House conferees appointed: Grier, Hill, Baker, Barnes, Collins
- Senate conferees appointed: Koenig, Bernskoetter, Eigel, Washington, May
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to exceed the differences on sections 131.1610 and 67.1461 S adopted
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Placed on Formal Calendar
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Economic Development
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Economic Development
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Economic Development
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred H Economic Development
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (O'Laughlin)
- SS S offered (Koenig)
- SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Brattin)
- SA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Bernskoetter)
- SS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways and Means Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Ways and Means Committee
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Ways and Means Committee
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Ways and Means Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (35)
0787S.06S
H distributes CCS
0787S06.1SR
H distributes CCR
0787S06.01F
Distributed
0787S05.39H
Distributed
0787S05.36H
Distributed
0787S05.33H
Distributed
0787S05.35H
Distributed
0787S05.30H
Distributed
0787S05.29H
Distributed
0787S05.01H
Adopted
0787S05.31H
Returned
0787S05.26H
Distributed
0787S05.27H
Distributed
0787S05.23H
Distributed
0787S05.22H
Adopted
0787S05.24H
Distributed
0787S05.20H
Distributed
0787S05.19H
Distributed
0787S05.02H
Distributed
0787S05.03H
Distributed
0787S05.18H
Adopted
0787S05.15H
Adopted
0787S05.12H
Distributed
0787S05.13H
Adopted
0787S05.10H
Distributed
0787S05.11H
Distributed
0787S05.07H
Distributed
0787S05.09H
Distributed
0787S05.04H
Distributed
0787S05.05H
Distributed
0787S05.06S
SA 3 to SS S offered & adopted (Bernskoetter)
0787S05.03S
SA 3 to SS S offered (Washington)
0787S05.05S
SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (O'Laughlin)
0787S05.02S
SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Brattin)
0787S.05F
SS S offered (Koenig)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor