+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education
- H Second Read
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Schupp)
- SS S offered (Hoskins)
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- SS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 218-Hoskins
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
0851S04.01S
SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Schupp)
0851S.04F
SS S offered (Hoskins)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor