+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 5 & 21 S Ways & Means Com.
On January 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor