+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Committee Vote Reconsidered S Civ. & Crim. Jur. Com.
- Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 214, 124, 209 & 322 S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 124, 214 & 209 S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee-Consent
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor