+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 204-Parson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor