+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Delivered to Governor
On May 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Signed by Senate President
On April 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
On April 30, 2001 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Miscellaneous Bills & Resolutions Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Miscellaneous Bills & Resolutions Committee - Consent
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Miscellaneous Bills & Resolutions Committee
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Miscellaneous Bills & Resolutions Com.
On February 27, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee-Consent
On February 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Scott
Type:
Primary Sponsor