+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 201-Onder, with SCS
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (0817S.02C)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 201-Onder
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor