+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Budget
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Budget
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Budget
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Budget
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Per request of the Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to return its report removing SB 185 from the consent calendar, bill was placed back on the consent calendar.
- Committee Vote Reconsidered
- Committee Report returned to S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Removed S Consent Calendar
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Health and Pensions Committee - Consent vote adopted
- Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 185-Wallingford
On December 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0964S02.03H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor