+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Retirement Committee
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Retirement Committee
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Retirement Committee
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Education Committee to Floor-Consent
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Education Committee-Consent
- Committee Vote Reconsidered S Education Committee
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee-Consent
On January 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor